Moore, et al v. Bank of America, et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Jean Moore and Gertrude V. Vizmanos
Defendant: Bank of America, Reconstrust Company, US Bank National Association, Harborview 2600-1 Trust, Amir Enterprises LLC, Melvin Strong, Judy Schilling, Hadi R. Sayid-Ali and Ed Turner
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02445
Filed: September 13, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/2010 re 13 ORDERING that within seven days from the date this order is served, plaintiff(s) shall file a revised notice of voluntary dismissal clarifying the issues addressed herein. Failure to file a revised notice of voluntary dismissal, as ordered herein, will be deemed a withdrawal of the December 1, 2010 notice of voluntary dismissal.(Duong, D)
December 22, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/22/10 Recommending that Plaintiff Moore's claims against defendant Turner be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) and that Moore be permitted to wit hdraw as a Plaintiff in this action. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 30, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/29/10: Defendant Schilling's motion to dismiss is denied as moot, and the January 12, 2011 hearing thereon is vacated 8 . Plaintiffs' ex parte application motion for the approval of the recordation of the notice of pending action is denied without prejudice 4 . Scheduling Conference continued to 4/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. On or before March 30, 2011, the parties shall file status reports, as required by the order issued on September 13, 2010 3 . (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/7/11 ORDERING 16 Findings and Recommendations are adopted; Plaintiff Moore's claims against defendant Turner are dismissed without prejudice; and plaintiff Moore is permitted to withdraw as a plaintiff in this action. (Matson, R)
February 7, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/11 ORDERING the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss, Dckt. Nos. 5 and 18, is continued to 3/9/11; Plaintiff shall show cause no later than 2/23/11 why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition; andplaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion or a statement of non-opposition no later than 2/23/11. (Matson, R)
March 2, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/1/11. It is ORDERED that the hearing date of 3/9/11 on 5 dfts' motion to dismiss is VACATED. The status (pretrial scheduling) conference currently set f or hearing on 4/13/11, is VACATED. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b), based on pltf's failure to prosecute the action and to comply with the court's orders and Local Rules. Defendants' 5 motion to dismiss be denied as moot; and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore, et al v. Bank of America, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Jean Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrude V. Vizmanos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstrust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview 2600-1 Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Enterprises LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Schilling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadi R. Sayid-Ali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]