Knapik v Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ramona Michelle Knapik
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02626
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/2/2011 ORDERING 17 that plaintiff may file her Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Remand of the Commissioner's Final Decision EXTENDED to 6/13/2011. (Reader, L)
November 22, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/11: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand is granted 19 . Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment is denied 20 . The Commissioner's decision is reversed. This matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Kaminski, H)
December 29, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/28/11: Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of THREE THOUSAND dollars ($3,000.00). (Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/29/10 GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP; the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigneds scheduling order in social security cases; the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Williams, D) Modified on 9/30/2010 (cc: US Marshall)(Williams, D).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapik v Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Michelle Knapik
Represented By: Richard Allen Whitaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]