California Hospital Association v. Maxwell-Jolly et al

Plaintiff: California Hospital Association
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly and California Department of Health Care Services
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv03465
Filed: December 27, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 01/25/11 ORDERING that the date for dfts to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 02/23/11. (Benson, A.)
January 28, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 01/28/11 GRANTING 14 Motion for TRO, This temporary injunction SHALL EXPIRE on February 11, 2011; GRANTING 13 Motion to Exceed Page Limits ; plaintiffs request to seal documents in support of the motion for a temporary restraining order is TENTATIVELY GRANTED; Any further proceedings concerning whether to issue a preliminary injunction will be determined by the District Court Judge assigned to this case. (Williams, D)
February 4, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/11 ORDERING that the Defendant's request for clarification of the temporary restraining order 21 is GRANTED; The temporary restraining order entered on 1/28/11 (Doc. No. 17, 5:8-12) is MO DIFIED as follows: The Department is TEMPORARILY ENJOINED from taking any further action to implement Section 14105.281 to the California Welfare and Institutions Code and SHALL REIMBURSE plaintiff's members at the unfrozen reimbursement rate for dates of service on or after 1/28/11. (Becknal, R)
March 4, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 3/4/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. The Court directs defendants to file a written motion for stay of the injunction pending defendants 9; appeal pursuant to FRCP 62(c). The court will consider the motion on an expedited briefing schedule. Defendants shall file their motion on or before March 10, 2011; plaintiff's opposition thereto shall be filed on or before March 15, 2011; and defendants may file a reply on or before March 17, 2011. If after review of the parties' briefing, the court finds that a hearing is necessary, it will promptly set a hearing date by Minute Order. (Krueger, M)
March 17, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 3/16/2011 GRANTING 37 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time. Dfts responsive pleading is due 3/25/2011. (Zignago, K.)
February 3, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 2/2/12. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
January 25, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/25/11: The action denominated CIV. S-10-3465 MCE KJN is reassigned to District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: CIV. S-10-3465 FCD EFB. The Clerk of Court issue an Order Requiring a Joint Status Report. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: California Hospital Association v. Maxwell-Jolly et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Hospital Association
Represented By: Jordan Brian Keville
Represented By: Lloyd A. Bookman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Linton
Represented By: Christine Michelle Murphy
Represented By: Julie Weng-Gutierrez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Linton
Represented By: Christine Michelle Murphy
Represented By: Julie Weng-Gutierrez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]