California Dump Truck Owners Association v. Air Resources Board

Defendant: Mary D Nichols and James Goldstene
Plaintiff: California Dump Truck Owners Association
Intervenor_defendant: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00384
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 8 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/6/11. (Kaminski, H)
May 23, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 NRDC's Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/20/11. The NRDC is ordered to file its Answer not later than 10 days following the date this Order is electronically filed. (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/20/11 re 29 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed July 5, 2011, is DENIED without prejudice to re-filing in conformity with the parties' agreement that any hearing on such Motion should occur on January 26, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. Plaintiff is ordered to refile its Motion with the new hearing date not earlier than Thursday, November 17, 2011. (Duong, D)
January 18, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/18/12 ORDERING that the hearing date for plaintiff's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and defendants' and defendant-intervenor's respective 45 Cross-Motions for Sum mary Judgment are CONTINUED to 02/09/12 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Based on this hearing date and this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order, NRDC and defendants' replies to plaintiff's opposition would be due by 02/02/12. (Benson, A.)
January 30, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2012 DENYING 31 Motion for Prelinimary Injunction. (Michel, G)
May 31, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/30/2012 ORDERING that not later than Thursday, 6/14/2012, Defendants and NRDC shall file Supplemental Briefs, not to exceed ten (10) pages each, addressing how the EPA decision cited above impacts t his case. Not later than Thursday, 6/28/2012, Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Opposition, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages. Not later than Thursday, 7/5/2012, NRDC and the ARB shall file Replies, not to exceed five (5) pages each. Not later than Thursday, 7/12/2012, Plaintiff shall file any Sur-Reply, not to exceed five (5) pages. (Zignago, K.)
July 19, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/18/12 ORDERING that this matter is SET for hearing on 8/9/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Not later than 4:00 p.m. on 8/2/2012, the parties are directed to file additional supplemental briefing, not to exceed 10 pages, on the question of whether the EPA is a necessary, and perhaps indispensable, party to the instant dispute. (Kastilahn, A)
October 30, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/29/12: Bench Trial set for 2/24/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; the parties shall file trial briefs not later than 12/5/2013; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; joint final pretrial statement is due not later than 11/28/2013; any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 11/28/2013; oppositions must be filed by 12/5/2013 and any reply must be filed by 12/12/2013. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
December 19, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/19/12 DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In light of this ruling, the Court does not reach the merits of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment and DENIES them as MOOT. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Dump Truck Owners Association v. Air Resources Board
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary D Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Goldstene
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Dump Truck Owners Association
Represented By: Patrick James Whalen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Lin Perrella
Represented By: David Pettit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]