Kurtz v. Intelius, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Kurtz
Defendant: Intelius, Inc, Adaptive Marketing LLC and Intelius Sales Company LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01009
Filed: April 15, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: John F. Moulds
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 31 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/27/11 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTIONS in response to the Complaint 13 , 16 , 21 , 22 shall be heard on 8/3/2011 at 09:30 AM. All papers in opposition to MOTIONS filed in response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before 7/15/2011. All Reply papers shall be filed on or before 7/27/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 9, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Transfer signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/8/11: CASE TRANSFERRED to Central District of California. It is further ordered that all other filed motions are stayed pending transfer. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
May 6, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/5/11 re 6 ORDERING that the time for the Intelius Defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended by 28 days from May 12, 2011 to June 9, 2011.(Duong, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kurtz v. Intelius, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kurtz
Represented By: William Richard Restis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelius, Inc
Represented By: Edward San Chang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adaptive Marketing LLC
Represented By: Robert James Herrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelius Sales Company LLC
Represented By: Edward San Chang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]