CytoSport, Inc. v. Proclaim Nutrition, LLC

Defendant: Proclaim Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff: CytoSport, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01323
Filed: May 16, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2011 13 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/1/2011 12 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 1/30/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. (Duong, D)
November 15, 2011 15 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 11/14/2011 ORDERING that based upon the foregoing Stipulation, and good cause appearing, Defendant's responsive pleading shall now be filed on or before 1/16/2012. (Zignago, K.)
January 17, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/17/12 CONTINUING Pretrial Scheduling Conference to 3/26/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the conference date. (Meuleman, A)
January 18, 2012 19 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/17/12: Defendant's responsive pleading shall now be filed on or before February 15, 2012. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CytoSport, Inc. v. Proclaim Nutrition, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proclaim Nutrition, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CytoSport, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]