Select Comfort Corporation v. Lateral Monopoly LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Select Comfort Corporation
Defendant: Christopher Kelso, David Stephens and Lateral Monopoly LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01488
Filed: June 1, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/3/2011 ORDERING that the November 10, 2011 hearing on plaintiff's 21 motion for default judgment, filed October 11, 2011, is VACATED and the motion is submitted on the record. (Duong, D)
November 17, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/11 RECOMMENDING that Select Comfort's motion for default judgment 21 be Granted in part and Denied in part; A permanent injunction be issued as to Lateral Mono poly; Select Comfort be awarded costs in the amount of $230.45; Select Comfort be awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $19,349; and the case be closed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
May 25, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dated *5/25/2012* in favor of Select Comfort Corporation against Lateral Monopoly, LLC pursuant to order signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/15/2011. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Select Comfort Corporation v. Lateral Monopoly LLC, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Comfort Corporation
Represented By: Andrew S. Hansen, PHV
Represented By: John Stuart Poulos
Represented By: Adam C. Trampe, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kelso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lateral Monopoly LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]