CytoSport, Inc. v. Select Milk Producers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CytoSport, Inc.
Defendant: Select Milk Producers, Inc. and Athlete's Honey Milk, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01705
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/18/11: Plaintiff, Cytosport, Inc. and defendants, Select Milk Producers, Inc. and Athletes Honey Milk, LLC, hereby stipulate to an initial 30-day extension within which defendants shall respond to the complaint. Defendants response is now due on September 9, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
September 12, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/11: Stipulation for 30-day extension of time is granted. Defendants response is now due on October 11, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
October 17, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 14 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/14/11 ORDERING the defendants response to the complaint is now due on 11/10/11. (Matson, R)
November 15, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/15/11 GRANTING a fourth 30-day extension, within which defendants shall respond to the complaint filed in this matter. Defendants' response is now due onDecember 12, 2011. (Becknal, R)
December 15, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/14/2011 re 19 ORDERING that the Defedants' response is now due on 1/11/2012. (Duong, D)
January 19, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/18/12: Defendants response to the complaint is due on February 10, 2012. (Kaminski, H)
March 9, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/8/12 GRANTING a 30-day extension within which Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. Plaintiff's responsive pleading is now due on or before 4/4/12. (Becknal, R)
April 10, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 31 for Extension of Time signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/6/2012. Plaintiff's responsive pleading is now due on or before 4/18/2012. (Marciel, M)
November 13, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 47 signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/9/12 ORDERING the hearing date for 42 Motion for Protective Order is reset for 12/6/2012 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Defendants' reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for protective order is now due on 11/22/12. (Matson, R)
December 10, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/7/12 ORDERING that Defendants' 42 motion for a protective order is DENIED; Plaintiff's 44 motion to compel is GRANTED; and Defendants' shall serve responses to plaintiff's first request for production ofdocuments and first interrogatories on or before 12/14/12. (Kastilahn, A)
December 20, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/19/12. (Kastilahn, A)
July 19, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/19/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions and Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in this matter 61 and 65 is continued to 8/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/6/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions and Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in this matter are hereby dropped from the Court's calendar, without prejudice to their reinstatement upon proper notice. (Kastilahn, A)
September 3, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/30/2013 GRANTING 74 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CytoSport, Inc. v. Select Milk Producers, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CytoSport, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Milk Producers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athlete's Honey Milk, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]