Farm and Trade, Inc. v. U.S. Rice Producers Association, Inc.

Plaintiff: Farm and Trade, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Rice Producers Association, Inc. and Dwight Roberts
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02306
Filed: August 30, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/31/12. The 10/21/13 Jury Trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 3/31/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The parties shall file trial b riefs not later than 1/23/2014. The 8/22/13 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and CONTINUED to 2/6/2014 at 02:00 PM. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due no later than 1/16/2014. Any Evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 1/16/14. Oppositions must be filed by 1/23/14 and any reply must be filed by 1/30/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 29, 2013 13 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/26/2013 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in this action. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
March 1, 2012 9 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/29/12: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/21/2013. Discovery due by 12/21/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/13/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Farm and Trade, Inc. v. U.S. Rice Producers Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm and Trade, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Rice Producers Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]