Xerox Corporation v. The Printing Press et al

Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Defendant: The Printing Press, Broadway Printing Press, Inc. and Courtney Mattson
Case Number: 2:2012cv00164
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/9/12 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 11 motion for default judgment against defendants be granted in the amount of $142,253.03. Motion referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Broadway Printing Press, Inc., Courtney Mattson, The Printing Press signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/19/2012. (Zignago, K.)
April 5, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/4/2012 ORDERING that the status conference is CONTINUED to 5/14/2012, at 3:00 P.M. The parties SHALL submit updated status reports no later than 14 days before the status conference. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xerox Corporation v. The Printing Press et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Tappan Zee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Printing Press
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Printing Press, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Mattson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]