Korte v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eugene Korte
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00541
Filed: February 29, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE AND CLAWBACK ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/18/12. (Matson, R)
January 14, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/11/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses continued from January 18, 2013 to February 15, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
May 6, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/2013 ORDERING 37 Plaintiff's points and authorities in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment are STRICKEN in their entirety; plaintiff is DIRECTED to file amended points and authorities in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment that conform with this order no later than 5/10/2013; defendant is GRANTED leave to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition by 5/17/2013; the hearing on defendant's 33 motion for summary judgment and/or partial summary judgment is CONTINUED to 5/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Reader, L)
June 11, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/11/2013 ORDERING 33 MOtion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as to plaintiff's claims for compensation (see Order); Defendant's Mo tion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to plaintiff's claims for retaliation under the First Amendment (see order); Defendants are DIRECTED to file Exhibits A-F to the Camp Declaration, and Exhibits H, I, S, and T to the McClain Declara tion, each redacted according to the instructions in this Order, no more than 7 days after the entry of this Order; Defendants are DIRECTED to file UNDER SEAL Exhibit A to the Whitemore Declaration and Exhibit K to the McClain Declaration no more tha n 7 days after entry of this Order; all other documents requested to be filed under seal or in redacted form are DENIED; Defendant is to file unsealed and unredacted version of these document no more than 7 days after the entry of this Order. (Waggoner, D)
September 12, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/11/2013 ORDERING that copies of each trial exhibit be exchanged by 10/14/2013; ORDERING that any objections to said exhibits be submitted by 10/28/2013. (Michel, G)
September 25, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/24/2013. Having reviewed the parties' 59 60 submissions,. Court is satisfied that it retains subject matter jurisdiction over this matter, despite plaintiff's concession that damages at issue are now less than $75,000.00. Accordingly, parties are DIRECTED to proceed as set forth in 56 Pretrial Order. (Marciel, M)
October 9, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/2013 ORDERING 62 Settlement Conference Reset for 11/1/2013 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Reader, L)
October 9, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/8/2013 ORDERING 63 The deadline to exchange copies of each trial exhibit shall be EXTENDED to 11/11/2013, and the deadline to submit any objections to said exhibits shall be 11/25/2013. (Reader, L)
November 19, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/18/2013 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED in its entirety, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. (41)(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party to this litigation shall bear his/its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in conjunction with this action. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Korte v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Korte
Represented By: Robert P. Biegler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen E. McClain
Represented By: Constance E. Norton
Represented By: John Charles Post
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]