E Clampus Vitus v. Steiner et al

Plaintiff: E Clampus Vitus
Defendant: David L. Steiner, Thomas Peak, John Moore, Karl Dodge and Joseph Zumwalt Chapter 169 E Clampus Vitus
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01381
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/18/12 ORDERING that Defendants' anti-SLAPP motion to strike is DENIED, and Defendants' dismissal motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted 14 days from the date on which this order is filed to file an amended complaint. Defendants' request for attorneys' fees under Rule 11 is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/23/13. Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause (OSC) in a writing to be filed no later than 1/28/2013, why sanctions should not be imposed against it and/or its counsel under Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failing to participate in the preparation and timely filing of a joint status report. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 2/11/2013, at 9:0 0 a.m., just prior to the status conference. The Status Conference is RESET to 2/11/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the status conference. (Kastilahn, A)
February 7, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and CONTINUING (Status Pretrial Scheduling) Conference signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/7/13. Plaintiff is ORDERED to Show Cause in writing to be filed no later than 2/11/13, why it and/or its counsel should not be san ctioned six hundred dollars ($600.00) for twice failing to participate in filing a timely joint status report and failing to respond to the 1/23/13 OSC. The Status Conference is RESCHEDULED to 3/4/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before J udge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Plaintiff is warned that the continued failure to comply with the Rules and/or this Court's orders could result in this action being dismissed with prejudice under Rule 41(b) and judgment entered in favor of Defendants. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/13/13 WITHDRAWING 20 Motion to Dismiss and VACATING hearing scheduled for 2/25/13. Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel are notified that the First Amended Complaint will be stricken unless a signed First Amended Complaint is filed on or before 2/21/13. (Meuleman, A)
February 28, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/28/2013 VACATING 23 Order to Show Cause and CONTINUING Status Conference to 5/13/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Sanctions will not be imposed. (Donati, J)
August 16, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/15/2013 ORDERING 35 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim is DENIED; Motion to strike the "Doe" defendants is GRANTED; Requests for sanctions and attorney's fees under Rule 11 and 28 USC 1927 are DENIED. (Waggoner, D)
September 12, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/12/12. Plaintiffs and Defendants are ORDERED to Show Cause in a writing to be filed no later than 9/21/2012, why sanctions should not be imposed against them for failure to file a timely status report . If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 10/15/2012 at 09:00 AM just prior to the Status Conference, which is RESCHEDULED to that date and time. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: E Clampus Vitus v. Steiner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Clampus Vitus
Represented By: Matthew Vincent Brady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Steiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Peak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Dodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Zumwalt Chapter 169 E Clampus Vitus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]