Dicey v. Smith

Defendant: Oscar J Smith
Plaintiff: Berlan Lynell Dicey
Case Number: 2:2012cv01407
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/2012 ORDERING that the 10 amended complaint is DISMISSED, with leave to file a second amended complaint, within twenty-eight days from the date of service of this order. Failure to file a second amended complaint will result in this action being dismissed. No further amendments will be allowed. (Zignago, K.)
November 21, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION THAT THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF STATUTES ARE CHALLENGED; AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS AND CASE-MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/20/12 ORDERING to ensure that the Attorney General receives this certificat ion, the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this certification on the Attorney General under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(a)(2), which is applicable to such service by a party, as follows: "either by certified or registered mail or by s ending it to an electronic address designated by the attorney general for this purpose; and Further, the hearing on each Defendant's motion for compulsory joinder scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on December 3, 2012, is continued to February 2 5, 2013 commencing at 9:00 a.m. The hearing on Plaintiff's motions for judgments on the pleadings scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on December 3, 2012, is continued to June 3, 2013,commencing at 9:00 a.m. Lastly, the Status Conference scheduled in each above action is continued to August 5, 2013, commencing at 9:00 a.m; a joint status report shall be filed fourteen days before this hearing. (cc: Attorney General)
February 14, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/14/13 ordering that for the reasons given above and in the court's 08/02/13 and 10/10/12 orders, this action is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
April 5, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/04/13 ordering the court finds that plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith, and that plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should be revoked. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (Case No. 13-15593)(cc: USCA-9th circuit). (Plummer, M)
June 14, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/13/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Dillon, M)
August 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/01/12 granting 6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. The complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
August 2, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Berlan Lynell Dicey signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/01/12. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicey v. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar J Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berlan Lynell Dicey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]