American Furniture Warehouse Corporation v. American Furniture Gallery, et. al.

Defendant: American Furniture Gallery, Alan Tran and Kevin Tran
Plaintiff: American Furniture Warehouse Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02911
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/6/2013 ORDERING 20 that defendant's time to file a responsive pleading to the complaint shall be EXTENDED to 6/12/2013. (Reader, L)
June 17, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/17/13 ORDERING that Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 6/26/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/9/13 DENYING AS MOOT 31 Motion to Amend the Complaint; Plaintiff shall file the proposed Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to 31 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint within 3 court days from the date on which this order is filed. Further, a Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 9/30/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Meuleman, A)
July 29, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/29/13 ORDERING that the dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 8/16/13. Further, the Status Conference scheduled for hearing on 9/30/13, will remain on calendar in the event no dispositional document is filed, or if this action is not otherwise dismissed. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 11, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/11/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause ("OSC") in a writing to be filed no later than 3/15/2013, why sanctions should not be imposed against it and/or its co unsel for failure to file a timely status report. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 5/13/2013, at 9:00 a.m., just prior to the status conference, which is rescheduled to that date and time. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American Furniture Warehouse Corporation v. American Furniture Gallery, et. al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Furniture Gallery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Tran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Tran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Furniture Warehouse Corporation
Represented By: Jarred Steven Lieber
Represented By: Kevin Alan Hughey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]