Sehic v. Anderson et al

Plaintiff: Emir Sehic
Defendant: William Van Anderson and Mayuka S Anderson
Case Number: 2:2012cv03030
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/13/13 ORDERING that a Telephone Status Conference is SET for 7/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Each party may, but is not required to, file and serve a separate status report on or before 7/19/13, of no more than 5 pages addressing the current state of the parties' dispute. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 29, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 4/12/13 MOTION to AMEND 18 is DENIED as having been rendered moot by the settlement agreement reached on 5/24/13; Plaintiff's 4/23/13 MOTION for Prel iminary Injunction 19 is DENIED as having been rendered moot by the settlement agreement reached on 5/24/13; Plaintiff's 5/16/13 MOTION to CONTINUED 22 is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff's 6/4/13 MOTION to AMEND 26 is DENIED as improperl y brought in light of the settlement agreement reached on 5/24/13; Within fourteen days of the date of this order Plaintiff shall file either a copy of the parties' signed settlement agreement and Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissa l pursuant thereto or a motion seeking to withdraw from the parties' settlement agreement that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules; and Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply with this order may result in an order dismissing this action for lack of prosecution. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/22/13: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Plaintiff shall file and serve his own separate status report on or before 3/15/13 and each defendant shall file and serve their own separate status report on or before 3/22/13. (Meuleman, A)
September 26, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/25/13 ORDERING that Defendants shall serve plaintiff with a copy of the opposition filed on 9/17/13 within seven days of the date of this order; and Plaintiff shall file his reply, if any, on or before 10/8/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 21, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/18/13 DENYING 36 Motion to Withdraw; DISMISSING action WITH PREJUDICE. This court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the material terms of the parties' 5/24/13 settlement agreement. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
February 11, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/11/15 re 49 Request to Enforce Settlement Agreement: IT IS ORDERED if appropriate following resolution of plaintiff's appeal, defendants may renew their request through the filing of a noticed motion to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sehic v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emir Sehic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Van Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayuka S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]