Cedarville Rancheria v. Cedarville County Water District

Defendant: Cedarville County Water District
Plaintiff: Cedarville Rancheria
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv03046
Filed: December 19, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Modoc
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 25:640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 13 Featured Case STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/12/13. Discovery deadline set for 11/11/2013. Law & Motion deadline set for 1/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.
September 12, 2013 17 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 16 extending deadline signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/12/2013. The Expert Witness Disclosure submission time line is CONTINUED to 9/27/2013. (Marciel, M)
September 27, 2013 19 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/27/13 ORDERING that the Request to Continue Witness Disclosure filing date is CONTINUED from 9/27/13 to 10/27/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 25, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/22/2013 DENYING parties' 23 Joint Request for Court to approve extension of deadling for filing rebuttals of Expert Witness Disclosures. (Marciel, M)
April 16, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/15/14 ORDERING Plaintiff's counsel TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 30 days of this order why he should not be sanctioned $250, or suffer a dismissal of plaintiff's case for lack of p rosecution. The Final Pretrial is CONTINUED to 9/22/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 12/2/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cedarville Rancheria v. Cedarville County Water District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedarville County Water District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedarville Rancheria
Represented By: Delia Parr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]