United States of America v. Approximately $143,058.81 in U.S. Currency seized from Wells Fargo Bank Personal Checking Account Number 2065307502, et. al.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $143,058.81 in U.S. Currency seized from Wells Fargo Bank Personal Checking Account Number 2065307502 and Approximately $173,450.00 in U.S. Currency seized from JP Morgan Chase Personal Checking Account Number 918200346
 
Case Number: 2:2012mc00058
Filed: July 27, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 10 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/22/2013 ORDERING that deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 11/6/2013. (Zignago, K.)
November 5, 2013 12 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/4/13 EXTENDING time for filing a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
November 5, 2013 13 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/4/13 ORDERING that deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 2/4/14. (Becknal, R) Modified on 11/5/2013 (Becknal, R).
February 4, 2014 15 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/14. The parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 3/21/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 30, 2012 2 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on July 30, 2012 re 1 . The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to November 6, 2012. (Rivas, A)
November 1, 2012 4 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/31/12 EXTENDING time for filing a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
February 6, 2013 6 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/6/13 EXTENDING time for filing a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
May 9, 2013 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on May 8, 2013 re 7 . The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to August 6, 2013. (Rivas, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $143,058.81 in U.S. Currency seized from Wells Fargo Bank Personal Checking Account Number 2065307502, et. al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $143,058.81 in U.S. Currency seized from Wells Fargo Bank Personal Checking Account Number 2065307502
Represented By: J Patrick McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $173,450.00 in U.S. Currency seized from JP Morgan Chase Personal Checking Account Number 918200346
Represented By: J Patrick McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]