Young v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Young, Jr.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00257
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/13/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to serve Magistrate Judge Newman's Order in Social Security and to serve copy of Order on US Marsha l. Within 14 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall submit to US Marshal Services 5 copies of the following: completed Summons, Complaint, Scheduling Order, and a completed USM-285 form. Plaintiff shall file a Statement with Court that documents have been submitted. (cc: US Marshal Services) (Marciel, M)
October 21, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/2013 ORDERING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 21 days, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosection and for failure to comply with court orders; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), within 21 days, if he does not intend to pursue his case at this time. (Michel, G)
December 5, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/5/2013 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this case. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) and the case closed. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. (Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Young v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Young, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]