Gill et al v. United States Department of Agriculture

Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Plaintiff: Dalwinder Kaur and Rashpal Singh Gill
Case Number: 2:2013cv00356
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/29/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 11 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/15/13 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
April 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/12/13. ORDERING the time for defendant to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED until May 27, 2013. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill et al v. United States Department of Agriculture
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalwinder Kaur
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashpal Singh Gill
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]