Jackson v. Naseer et al

Defendant: T. Tseng, Sahir Naseer and C. Smith
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00548
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J.Hamilton on 3/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013) [Transferred from cand on 3/20/2013.]
September 20, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/19/13 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition.(Dillon, M)
December 5, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/4/13 ORDERING that clerk is directed to randomly assign this case to a district judge; it is RECOMMENDED that defendants motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 27 , 28 ) be granted, that all outstanding motions be denied, and that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Naseer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahir Naseer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.