Simmons v. Superior Court of Sacramento, et al.

Defendant: Lawrence Brown and Superior Court of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Ronald Simmons
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00592
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Simmons signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/6/2013. Plaintiff's 2 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED and plaintff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Sheriff is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk shall serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
July 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/29/2013 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge to this case and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case has been assigned to US District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton and US Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison; the new case number is 2:13-cv-0592 LKK CMK (PC).(Yin, K)
August 2, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/1/13 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Simmons v. Superior Court of Sacramento, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Sacramento
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]