Ramirez v. Mirnda et al

Defendant: J. Mayes, R. Medina, Lun Jackson, Bonnie Lee, D. Swingle, P. A. Mirnda, Santana and D. Royston
Plaintiff: Andrew Ramirez
Case Number: 2:2013cv00600
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/04/14 ordering plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected in accordanc with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Amendment and submit it along with an original and 1 copy of the amended complaint.(Plummer, M)
June 5, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Andrew Ramirez signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/04/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
July 23, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/23/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson; and within 30 days from the date of this order, the court requests that Supervising Deputy Attorney Monica Anderson confirm whether or not plaintiff is deceased and, if so, provide the court with the name and address of plaintiffs next of kin. (cc Monica Anderson)(Dillon, M)
July 30, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/30/14 ordering plaintiff's 11/15/13 death is suggested on the record. Within 45 days from the date of this order, plaintiff's next of kin, Andrew Ramirez Jr. is requested to complet adn file the appended notice. The clerk of the court is directed to serve this order, a copy of the 06/05/14 order 10 and the 7/25/14 response 14 , on plaintiff's next of kin, Andrew Ramirez Jr., 4481 Heather Circle, Chino, California, 91710 and include a postage paid return envelop addressed to the court. (Plummer, M)
October 2, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/01/14 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to forward to the United States Marshal a copy of the instant order, the 07/30/14 suggestion of death on the record and order 15 and a compl eted USM-285 form for service on Mr. Ramirez Jr. Within 14 days from the date of this order, the United States Marshal shall personall serve Andrew Ramirez Jr., 4481 Heather Circle, Chino, California, 91710 with the instant order, and a copy of the 07/30/14 suggestion of death on the record and order. Within 90 days from the date of personal service, plaintiff's next of kin, Andrew Ramirez, Jr. shall file a motion for substitution in this action, if he so desires. The clerk of the court is relieved of the obligation to serve plaintiff with a copy of the instant order because plaintiff is deceased. (Copy of this order, 1 completed USM-285 form and copy of suggestion of death and order 15 served on the U.S. Marshal)(Plummer, M)
March 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/26/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) [Transferred from cand on 3/27/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Mirnda et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Medina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lun Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Swingle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. A. Mirnda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Royston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Ramirez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]