Smith v. United States District Court for the Northern District

Respondent: Marion Spearman and United States District Court for the Northern District
Petitioner: Steven R. Smith
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00605
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/3/13 denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
May 21, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/20/13 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the: a) pending motion granted b) action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and c) action dismissed on plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules and a court order. (Plummer, M)
July 2, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/2/13 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
March 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The clerk shall transfer this matter forthwith. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from cand on 3/29/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. United States District Court for the Northern District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marion Spearman
Represented By: Larenda Rai Delaini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States District Court for the Northern District
Represented By: Larenda Rai Delaini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven R. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]