HSBC Bank USA et al v. Renner et al

Defendant: Rosemary L. Renner and Randall J. Renner
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00608
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/4/13: ORDERING that plaintiff's April 3, 2013 motion to remand 6 is denied without prejudice as moot and is dropped from the court's May 10, 2013 calendar. RECOMMENDING that this action be summarily remanded to the Amador County Superior Court and that this case be closed. F&R referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
June 24, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/24/13 ADOPTING IN FULL 10 Findings and Recommendations; REMANDING CASE to Amador County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
March 29, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER To Transfer Case To The Sacramento Division Of The Eastern District Of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/28/2013. (Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA et al v. Renner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary L. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Michael David Zeff
Represented By: Robert Lynn Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael L. Withem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]