Williams et al v. Canning et al

Defendant: Treasury Bank National Association, Robert J. Jackson and Associates, Inc., Todd Delorefice, Kirk Hull, SOL Homes, LLC, Dare Delorefice and Joseph M. Canning
Plaintiff: Karen Burton and Sandra Williams
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00631
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/19/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs show cause in writing within twenty-one days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to timely file the required writing will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 16, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/13 RECOMMENDING that 6 MOTION to DISMISS renoticed for hearing as 9 MOTION to DISMISS be denied as moot; 15 MOTION to STRIKE be denied as moot; plaintiffs ' claims be dismissed without prejudice due to lack of prosecution, as evidenced by plaintiffs' failure to file opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the motion to dismiss; and that this case be closed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
April 2, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/2/2013 DENYING 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams et al v. Canning et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury Bank National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Jackson and Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Delorefice
Represented By: Matthew R. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Hull
Represented By: Matthew R. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOL Homes, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dare Delorefice
Represented By: Matthew R. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Canning
Represented By: Matthew R. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]