United States of America v. Approximately $189,040.00 in U.S. Currency

Claimant: Asif Hafeez
Defendant: Approximately $189,040.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00643
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/23/13 GRANTING 10 Motion to Proceed IFP; GRANTING 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and DENYING 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Asif Hafeez answer due 7/8/2013. Plaintiff's request for appointment of a special investigator is DENIED. The United States shall file a response to 11 Motion to Stay within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
May 24, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court [DISREGARD- DUPLICATE of 14 Order] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/23/13 ORDERING that Claimant Hafeezs motion to proceed in forma pauperis 10 is GRANTED. Claimant Hafeezs motion to appoint counsel 12 is DENIED. Cla imant Hafeezs motion for an extension of time to file an answer 9 is GRANTED. Claimant Hafeezs answer shall be filed and served no later than July 8, 2013. Claimant Hafeezs request for appointment of a special investigator is DENIED. (Dillon, M) Modified on 5/24/2013 (Donati, J).
June 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/17/2013 ORDERING 24 The deadline to submit a joint status report is POSTPONED until the resolution of theclaimant's motion to stay and the United States' motion to strike the claim based on a lack of standing. 24 (Reader, L)
June 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/17/2013 SETTING a Motion Hearing as to 11 Motion to Stay, 20 , 24 Motions to Strike Claimant Hafeez' claim to 8/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; ORDERING Claimant Hafeez to file any Opposition by 7/25/2013; ALLOWING the United States to file a Reply, if any, by 8/1/2013; POSTPONING the deadline to submit a Joint Status Report until 28 days after a final resolution of the Motion to Stay and the Motions to Strike. (Michel, G)
August 9, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/13 RECOMMENDING that the United States's motion to strike 20 , 24 be GRANTED. Hafeez's motion to stay the action 11 be DENIED AS MOOT. Matter referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
November 6, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/6/13 DENYING as moot the 11 Motion to Stay and GRANTING the United States' 24 Motion to Strike. (Manzer, C)
January 10, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/14 ORDERING that the 1/16/14 hearing is VACATED and RECOMMENDING that the 36 Motion for Default Judgment be granted. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
April 5, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/4/13. (Kaminski, H)
April 16, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Clerk's Issuance of warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $189,040.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Asif Hafeez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $189,040.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]