Butler v. Swarthout

Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Petitioner: Ronald Bernard Butler
Case Number: 2:2013cv00662
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/4/14 ORDERING that 11 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED; and petitioner may file a response within 30 days of the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
January 16, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/15/2015 RECOMMENDING that respondent's 10 motion to dismiss be granted. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 11, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/11/13 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Bernard Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.