Reif v. Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stanley Reif
Defendant: BCI Coca-Cola Bottling Company of Los Angeles
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00666
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 11 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/11/2013 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing as to 6 Motion to Remand to 7/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G)
July 29, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/13 ORDERING the Court finds that the removing Defendant has not demonstrated by a preponderance of the evidence that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. As such, this Court lacks REMANDING CASE to Superior Court for Stanislaus County. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2013 17 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/30/13. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2013 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/3/2013 ORDERING the parties current deadline to confer as required by Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the corresponding deadline to submit a joint status report should be extended until after this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand. The hearing for this motion is currently scheduled for June 19, 2013. (Waggoner, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reif v. Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Reif
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Represented By: John Paul Briscoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCI Coca-Cola Bottling Company of Los Angeles
Represented By: Benjamin L. Webster
Represented By: Barbara Allyn Blackburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]