Banga v. Gundumolgula et al

Defendant: Emirates Airlines, Prasad Gundumolgula, Sheen Travel and Alexander Anolik
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00667
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/13 GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to 5 Motion to Dismiss no later than 6/12/13. Failure to file opposition may result in a recommendation th at this action be dismissed. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 6/26/13. The hearing date of 5/29/13 is VACATED. Hearing on 5 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Emirates Airlines is CONTINUED to 7/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Plaintiff's 9 Request for entry of default is DENIED. Defendant Prasad Gundumolgula shall file a responsive pleading no later than 6/12/13. (Meuleman, A)
June 26, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/26/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 16 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
July 10, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/10/2013: Plaintiff may file a sur-reply to defendant's Motion to Dismiss 5 no later than 7/17/2013. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall thereafter stand submitted. (Owen, K)
July 11, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/11/2013: The 8/7/2013 hearing date on defendants Vexatious Litigant Motion (ECF No. 13 ) is vacated. Plaintiff shall file opposition to the vexatious litigant motion no later than July 24, 20 13. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than July 31, 2013. Defendants motion to dismiss shall thereafter stand submitted. This action is stayed as against defendants Gundumolgula, Anolik, and Sheen Travel pending resolution of the vexatious litigant motion. (Owen, K)
July 19, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/19/13 ORDERING that the hearing date of 8/21/13 on Plaitiff's MOTION to Amend is VACATED; Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend 22 is DENIED as moot. And IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant' ;s MOTION to DISMISS 5 be granted; and Defendant Emirates be dismissed with prejudice. These FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 13, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/2013 GRANTING 35 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDERING that any Objections to 30 Findings and Recommendations be filed by 8/19/2013. (Michel, G)
August 23, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/23/13 ORDERING that defendants' vexatious litigant motion (ECF No. 13) is denied without prejudice; and RECOMMENDING that this action be remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Solano, Vallejo Branch. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
September 12, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/10/2013 ORDERING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full; 5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and defendant Emirates Airlines is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
September 25, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/24/13 ADOPTING in full 40 Findings and Recommendations; the court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction under 28 USC Section 1367(c); REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of California, County of Solano, Vallejo Branch. Copy of remand order sent to other court. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Banga v. Gundumolgula et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emirates Airlines
Represented By: Kevin Richard Sutherland
Represented By: Scott J. Lantry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prasad Gundumolgula
Represented By: Alexander Anolik
Represented By: Adam Avi Anolik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheen Travel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Anolik
Represented By: Alexander Anolik
Represented By: Adam Avi Anolik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]