Samuels v. Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.

Defendant: Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Samuels
Case Number: 2:2013cv00713
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 7/5/13: The 7/8/2013 status (pretrial scheduling) conference is hereby VACATED; Plaintiff has until 9/30/2013, to file a motion in which leave is sought to file an Ame nded Complaint to add a new defendant; the parties have until 12/2/2013, to file a motion in which leave is sought to amend their pleadings in response to information obtained during discovery; All discovery shall be completed by 10/14/2014; Designa tion of Expert Witnesses due by 4/7/2014, and any contradictory and/or rebuttal expert disclosure is due by 5/5/2014; The last hearing date for a motion is 12/22/2014 at 9:00 a.m.; The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/23/2015 at 11:00 AM in C ourtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.., A joint pretrial statement shall be filed no later than seven (7) calendar days prior to the final pretrial conference; Trial is set for 5/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
October 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/22/13: The deadline to file a motion to amend the pleadings under FRCP 15(a) is extended from its current date of December 2, 2013 to January 31, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
January 16, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/15/14 re: 14 EXTENDING Deadline to File FRCP 15(a) Motion to Amend Pleadings and Expert Disclosure Deadlines. (Meuleman, A)
February 14, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/13/2014 ORDERING that the parties' 16 request for entry of the proposed stipulated protective order is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
February 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/25/2014 GRANTING the parties Stipulated Protective Order. (Reader, L)
June 13, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 20 to continue disclosure deadline signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/13/2014. Initial Expert Disclosure deadline is CONTINUED to 8/22/2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure now due 9/12/2014. (Marciel, M)
August 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/14/2014 to further EXTEND Expert Disclosure Deadlines and to EXTEND discovery cut-off date. (Donati, J)
September 19, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/18/14. (Kaminski, H)
November 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/13/14 ORDERING that the deadline to complete the specified depositions is CONTINUED from the current date of 11/14/14 to 1/31/2015. The parties have further agreed to and propose permitting responses to the specified outstanding written discovery requests to be served on or before 11/19/2014.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/9/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 35 Request to Seal Documents is DENIED. Further, since Local Rule 141(e)(1) prescribes that if a sealing "[r]equest is denied in full or in part, the C lerk will return to the submitting party the documents for which sealing has been denied," the documents emailed to the courtroom deputy clerk for judicial in camera consideration are treated as having been returned to the moving parties. (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on March 13, 2015. Dispositional document shall be filed no later than May 11, 2015. Failure to respond by this deadline may be construed as consent to dismissal of this ac tion without prejudice, and a dismissal order could be filed. Further, in light of the referenced settlement 65 , the pending motion for summary judgment (ECF No 28 ) is deemed withdrawn, and the final pretrial conference scheduled for hearing on March 30, 2015, is vacated. (Rivas, A)
May 13, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/13/15. A dispositional document shall be filed no later than June 6/15/2015.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuels v. Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Hankins
Represented By: Sarah Diane Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Samuels
Represented By: Sandra Jane Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.