Singh v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kevin Singh
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00729
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/24/13 GRANTING 5 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and scheduling hearing re 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court now ORDERS defendant to cancel the sale scheduled to ta ke place on 4/22/13. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby scheduled for 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Plaintiff's Motion shall not be filed later than 4/24/13 and defendant's Opposition shall be filed not later than 4/25/13. Any reply shall be filed not later than 4/26/13. (Meuleman, A)
May 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/1/13: Plaintiff is order to pay $1,000 bond by Monday, May 6, 2013 14 . Pursuant to Plaintiff's filing, ReconTrust is dismissed and no longer a Defendant in this case. (Kaminski, H)
June 3, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the Clerk to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Singh v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Michael J. Peng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Singh
Represented By: Aldon Louis Bolanos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]