Luna v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Assocation, Mortgage Electric Registration Systems, Inc., ReconTrust Company, N.A., and Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Benjamin L. Luna
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00732
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/13 ORDERING that the 7/17/13 hearing on Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS is VACATED from calendar; and IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS 13 be granted in part; Plaintiff's Counter-Motion 20 be denied as moot; Plaintiff's TILA rescission claim be dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiff's remaining state law claims be dismissed without prejudice to renewal in state court. These FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS are submitted to U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 29, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/2013 GRANTING 24 plaintiff's motion for extension of time; plaintiff shall file his response to the Findings and Recommendations 23 on or before 8/15/2013. (Reader, L)
August 20, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/19/2013 ORDERING that all dates in this matter are VACATED. All motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The 7/9/2013 findings and recommendations are VACATED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Luna v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Assocation
Represented By: Joseph V. Quattrocchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electric Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph V. Quattrocchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company, N.A.,
Represented By: Joseph V. Quattrocchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Joseph V. Quattrocchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin L. Luna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]