Mosier v. Central Intelligence Agency

Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Plaintiff: Phillip Mosier
Case Number: 2:2013cv00744
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC for the Eastern District of California., Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Phillip Mosier, 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or Alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed by Central Intelligence Agency.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013) Modified on 4/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from cand on 4/16/2013.]
August 5, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/2/13: The hearing for the motions for summary judgment 26 , 27 is RESET for 10/3/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
September 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 51 to re-set filing deadline signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/2013. Each party's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts is due no later than 9/9/2013 at 12:00 noon. Each party's Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts now due no later than 10/1/2013. (Marciel, M)
November 27, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/26/2013 GRANTING 26 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims; DENYING 37 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosier v. Central Intelligence Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Mosier
Represented By: Avner David Sofer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]