Frazier v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Karrie Ann Frazier
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00756
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/24/13 RE: 17 APPROVING Commissioner's First Extention to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. (Meuleman, A)
September 5, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/4/2014 RECOMMENDING that the 16 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; RECOMMENDING that the 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be denied; RECOMMENDING that this matter be remanded for further processing consistent with this order; RECOMMENDING that the Clerk of Court be directed to enter judgment and close this file; REFERRING this matter to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed within 14 days. (Michel, G)
June 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/7/13 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM within 15 days and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted; the USM is directed to serve process within 60 days. (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrie Ann Frazier
Represented By: Barbara Marie Rizzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]