Wade v. Office of Comptroller & Currency, et al.

Defendant: United States of America, Wells Fargo, N.A. and Office of Comptroller & Currency
Plaintiff: Robert I. Wade
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00758
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/31/13 RESETTING Hearing as to 5 MOTION to DISMISS for 7/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion no later than 7/3/2013. (Meuleman, A)
July 12, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/12/13 VACATING hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss; DENYING 17 Motion and 21 Motion; GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss and 18 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING 1 Complaint. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Meuleman, A)
August 30, 2013 32 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/29/2013 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice against defendant OCC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. OCC's 25 motion to dismis s is DENIED as moot. The 9/25/2013 hearing on OCC's motion to dismiss is VACATED from calendar. Each party to this stipulation shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. The case shall proceed forward with the remaining defendant(s). (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/19/2013 GRANTING defendant Wells Fargo's 26 Motion to Dismiss and 27 Request for Judicial Notice. The 9/25/2013 Motion Hearing is VACATED. Plaintiff's 24 First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file Second Amended Complaint within 30 days from date of this Order. (Marciel, M)
September 30, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/30/13 denying plaintiff's 38 motion to rescind trustee's sale. (Kastilahn, A)
December 3, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/2/2013. Defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/11/2013 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 1/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC). Within 7 days from date of Order, defendant shall re-serve its Motion to Dismiss on plaintiff at 45 new addressed provided. Plaintiff shall file Opposition, if any, to Motion no later than 1/15/2014. (Marciel, M)
January 2, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/31/2013 DISMISSING CASE, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re 48 Stipulation for Dismissal; VACATING all dates currently set in this matter. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wade v. Office of Comptroller & Currency, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Comptroller & Currency
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert I. Wade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]