Varletta Young v. County of San Joaquin et al

Plaintiff: Lei Ann Varletta Young
Defendant: John Brinton, Jim Buzo, Tim Doe, San Joaquin County District Attorney's Office, County of San Joaquin and City of Manteca
Case Number: 2:2013cv00761
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/2014 ORDERING Plaintiff shall show cause in writing within 14 days of the date of this order why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. The 5/21/2014 initial scheduling conference is VACATED until further court order. (Reader, L)
July 1, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/1/2014 VACATING the 10 Order to Show Cause; RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court order; REFERRING this matter to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen days. (Michel, G)
June 18, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/18/2013 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 20 days, a completed Application to Proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to send the Plaintiff a new Application to Proceed IFP. (Michel, G)
July 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/16/13 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Matter referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
December 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/27/2013 ORDERING The findings and recommendations 4 are VACATED; Plaintiff's 2 , 6 requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED; Service is appropriate for San Joaquin Cou nty, the City of Manteca, the San Joaquin District Attorney's Office, Jim Buzo, Tim Doe, and John Brinton; the Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the USM is directed to serve within 90 days of the date of this order all proce ss pursuant to FRCP 4, including a copy of this court's status order, without prepayment of costs; The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for con sent to trial by a magistrate judge, and this court's status order; Plaintiff is directed to supply the USM, within 15 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. [cc: USM] (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varletta Young v. County of San Joaquin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lei Ann Varletta Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brinton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Buzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County District Attorney's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Joaquin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manteca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]