Bluet-Harrison v. GMRI, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Briana Bluet-Harrison
Defendant: GMRI, Inc. and Darden Restaurants, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00777
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/19/2013 ORDERING Class Certification Motion shall be filed by 1/15/2014; this Pretrial Scheduling Order will become final without further order of the Court unless objections are filed within 7 court days of service of this Order.(Waggoner, D)
January 15, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Class Certification by 2/14/2014; ORDERING the defendants to file an Opposition Brief by 3/17/2014; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Reply Brief by 4/14/2014; ORDERING that said motion be noticed for hearing on 5/8/2014 at 2:00 PM. (Michel, G)
February 12, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/11/2014 ORDERING that, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is set as follows: Deadline for Plaintiff to file Motion for Class Certification: 3/3/2014; Deadline for Defendants to file Opposition brief: 4/2/2014; Deadline for Plaintiff to file Reply brief: 5/2/2014; Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification: 6/5/2014 at 2:00 p.m.. (Zignago, K.)
March 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2014 CONTINUING the deadline to file a Motion for Class Certification to 5/12/2014; CONTINUING the deadling for the defendants to file an opposition brief to 6/12/2014; CONTINUING the deadline for the plaintiff to file a reply brief to 7/14/2014; ORDERING that any Motion for Class Certification be noticed for hearing on 7/31/2014 at 2:00 PM. (Michel, G)
June 5, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/5/2014 ORDERING the hearing as to the 40 Motion for Class Certification CONTINUED to 8/28/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Donati, J)
June 24, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/20/14 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendants to file Opposition brief is 8/14/2014. The deadline for Plaintiff to file Reply brief is 9/8/2014. The hearing on Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED to 10/23/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
September 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on September 3, 2014 GRANTING third stipulation to continue deadline on motion for class certification 50 . The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Reply in support of her Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED from September 8, 2014 to September 22, 2014.(Rivas, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bluet-Harrison v. GMRI, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Bluet-Harrison
Represented By: Miriam Leigh Schimmel
Represented By: Katherine Carol Denbleyker
Represented By: Joshua David Carlon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMRI, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy E. Pritikin
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Nancy E. Pritikin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]