Heram v. United States Government

Defendant: United States Government
Plaintiff: Ram Heram
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00780
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER DISCHARGING 8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/21/2013. No sanctions will be imposed. (Marciel, M)
January 8, 2014 20 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/2014 GRANTING government's 15 Ex Parte Application for continuance. Status Conference is RE-SCHEDULED for 3/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB). The deadline to submit required Status Report is EXTENDED until 14 days prior of new date set for Status Hearing. (Marciel, M)
May 16, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/15/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk shall sent plaintiff 1 USM-285 form (w/instruction sheet), 1 Summons, a copy of 1 Complaint, this Court's Scheduling Order, the form providing Notice of Magistrate Judge's Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction, Court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. Plaintiff shall supply U.S. Marshal, w/in 14 days from date Order is filed, all informati on needed to effect service. Within 14 days thereafter, plaintiff shall file a Statement with Court that said documents have been submitted to U.S. Marshal. Clerk directed to serve copy of Order on U.S. Marshal. Failure to complay may result in recommendation that action be dismissed. [cc: US Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
September 16, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/16/2013 ORDERING the Status Conference CONTINUED to 1/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall supply the US Marshal with all information and documents needed to effect service of process. Within 14 days thereafter, file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the US Marshal. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before 10/14/2013 why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to follow court orders. Status Reports (or a joint status report) due by 1/8/2014.(Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Heram v. United States Government
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ram Heram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]