Jackson v. Traquina et al

Plaintiff: Walter Jackson
Defendant: Alvaro Traquina, De La Vega and A. Pfile
Case Number: 2:2013cv00781
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/22/2014 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint; plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights complaint.(Yin, K)
November 17, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/17/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint 12 is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the following: a. A copy of this order; b. A blank form used in this district for filing a prisoner civil rights complaint; c. One copy each of plaintiffs prior complaints (ECF Nos. 1 , 9 and 12 ).(Dillon, M)
January 23, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/2015 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
April 28, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/28/15: Plaintiff is advised that documents filed by plaintiff since the closing date will be disregarded and no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Kaminski, H)
May 2, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp applcation.(Yin, K)
June 4, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/3/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 6 request to proceed IFP; DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint; and within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the Notice of Amendment with the required documents. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Traquina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro Traquina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pfile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.