Farmers Insurance Exchange, et al v. Steele Insurance Agency Inc., et al

Defendant: Larry McCarren, Steele Insurance Agency, Inc., Troy Steele, Ted Blalock, Bill Henton and Cindy Jo Perkins
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company and Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00784
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/30/2013 ORDERING 5 that Plaintiffs' motion for tempporary restraining order is DENIED. (Reader, L)
May 16, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/16/2013 GRANTING 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
July 25, 2013 34 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/23/13 ORDERING that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' first and second claims 12 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' third, fourt h, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth and ninth claims 12 is GRANTED. These causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. Not later than twenty (20) days following the date of this Memorandum and Order is electronically file d, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed within said twenty (20) day period, without further notice to the parties, the causes of action dismissed by virtue of this Memorandum and Order will be dismissed with prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 4, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/13 ORDERING that the parties' 10/25/13 REQUEST for entry of the proposed stipulated Order 44 is DENIED without prejudice.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 14, 2013 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/13/2013 ORDERING that Blalock's 37 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Farmer' second cause of action and GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND as to Farmers' fifth cause of action. The Steele Insurance Agency, Steele, McCarren, Perkins, and Henton's 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Not later than thirty (30) days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiffs may (but are not required to) file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed within said thirty (30) day period, without further notice to the parties, the cause of action dismissed by virtue of this Memorandum and Order will be dismissed with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
February 5, 2014 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/4/14 DENYING 49 Motion to Dismiss and 50 Motion to Dismiss. (Meuleman, A)
May 14, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/13/14 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 6/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Statements are due at least 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
May 14, 2014 70 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/14 ORDERING that Cross-Defendants' anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike 60 is GRANTED; Cross-Defendants' request for Attorneys' fees 60 is DENIED; Cross- Defendant s' Motion to Dismiss 60 is therefore DENIED AS MOOT; and Cross- Claimants may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. If no amended complaint is filed, the cause of action stricken by this Order shall be dismissed with prejudice.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2014 77 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/8/2014 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 74 Motion to Strike, 75 Motion to Dismiss to 8/7/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that oppsositions be filed by 7/24/2014; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 7/31/2014. (Michel, G)
July 30, 2014 79 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/29/14 re 78 . (Meuleman, A) Modified on 7/30/2014 (Meuleman, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange, et al v. Steele Insurance Agency Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry McCarren
Represented By: William B. Hanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steele Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: William B. Hanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Steele
Represented By: William B. Hanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Blalock
Represented By: Michael Brady Read
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Henton
Represented By: William B. Hanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Jo Perkins
Represented By: William B. Hanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]