Waldo v. Eli Lilly & Company

Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Plaintiff: Angela Waldo
Case Number: 2:2013cv00789
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/30/13 ORDERING Defendant's motion to dismiss is currently set for hearing on 10/7/13. (ECF No. 18 .)The court does not find oral argument to be necessary and will decide the motion on the papers. Accordingly, the hearing on the motion is VACATED. (Becknal, R)
October 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/7/2013 ORDERING 18 Plaintiff' first, ninth, twelfth, and fourteenth causes of action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's fourth, tenth, eleventh, thirteenth, fifteenth, and sixteenth causes of action are DISMISSED without prejudice. The remainder of defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint no more than 21 days after entry of this order. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/7/14 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 38 is currently set for hearing on 1/13/14. The court does not find oral argument to be necessary and will decide the motion on the papers. Accordingly, the hearing on the motion is VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 14, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/14/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's ninth cause of action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The remainder of defendant's 38 motion to dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint no more than 21 days after entry of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
October 17, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/17/14. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldo v. Eli Lilly & Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Waldo
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell, PHV
Represented By: Mark Premo-Hopkins, PHV
Represented By: Michael Andrew Rollin
Represented By: Christopher L. Schnieders, PHV
Represented By: Joseph J Zonies, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]