Fagundes v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Fagundes
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00797
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/8/2013 ORDERING 17 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED; 19 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; the hearing on defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 8/9/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd; Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 7/26/2013; Defendants' reply shall be filed on or before 8/2/2013; 20 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application is DENIED. (Waggoner, D)
November 6, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/14 DENYING without prejudice 30 Motion to Vacate. (Manzer, C)
November 24, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/14 ORDERING that Defendant's 34 motion to intervene is granted. Defendant's 33 motion to expunge notice of lis pendens is granted. Plaintiff's Notice of Pending Action, recorded as DOC-2014-0042052-00, on June 24, 2014, in the Placer County Recorder's Office, against the real property located at 3993 Coldwater Drive, Rocklin, CA 95765, is expunged. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagundes v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Fagundes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ian Rowe Ross
Represented By: Cara Lynne Finan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Ian Rowe Ross
Represented By: Cara Lynne Finan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]