Springfield v. Allen, et al.

Defendant: E. Arnold, K. Allen and V. Singh
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Case Number: 2:2013cv00809
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/2013 ORDERING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
September 17, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/17/13 GRANTING 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants are granted an additional 30 days, to and including October 16, 2013, within which to file a responsive pleading to the complaint in this action.(Dillon, M)
January 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/14 ORDERING that that the action denominated as No. 2:13-cv-0809 KJN P is reassigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. 2:13-cv-0809 KJM AC P and any and all dates currently set before the Honorable Kendall J. Newman only are hereby vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
August 12, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/12/14 ORDERING that Defendants motion for a protective order, ECF No. 65 in No. 2:12-cv-2552 KJM AC P, seeking a stay of discovery pending resolution of the motion for summary judgment on groun ds of a failure to exhaust administrative remedies and the motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted; and, Defendants motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs request for production of documents, ECF No. 69 in Case No. 2:12-cv-2552, is denied as moot.(Dillon, M)
August 14, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/13/2014 DENYING the 22 motion to consolidate cases, without prejudice to its renewal upon adjudication of the motions at ECF Nos. 51 and 54 in Case No. 2:12-cv-2552; defendants Allen, Singh and Arnold in Case No. 2:13-cv-0809 must file their response to the 5/8/2013 complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
May 2, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 request to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent CDC order; within 21 days, plaintiff shall sign, date, and refile the 13 page complaint; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a copy of pages 1-13 of plaintiff's complaint 1 . (Yin, K)
May 2, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ciron B. Springfield signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2013. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
May 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/22/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Clerk of the Court shall separate pages 3 to 15 from plaintiffs May 13, 2013 filing 7 and docket the signed, original complaint (ECF No. 7:3-15) as a separate docket entry, filed May 8, 2013. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: K. Allen, V. Singh, and E. Arnold. Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff three USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed May 8, 2013.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springfield v. Allen, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]