Clarklift West v. Sentry Select Insurance Company, et al

Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance Company and Craig DiBlasi
Plaintiff: Clarklift West
Case Number: 2:2013cv00815
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/13 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 5 shall be heard on 7/1/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/30/2013 ORDERING 14 that Sentry Insurance Company, is DROPPED from this action and Sentry Select Insurance Company is added to this action as defendant. (Reader, L)
July 5, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/3/13: Plaintiff's request to remand this case to the state court be, and the same hereby, is GRANTED. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, in and for the County of Sacramento. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby, is DENIED as MOOT. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarklift West v. Sentry Select Insurance Company, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Represented By: Linda Wendell Hsu
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig DiBlasi
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Represented By: Linda Wendell Hsu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarklift West
Represented By: Robert P. Biegler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]