The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Morgan et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Andrea Morgan, Ingerlisha Martinez, A.M. (minor child of Ingerlisha Martinez) and D. P.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00820
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 18 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/2013. Parties shall file their Joint Case Management Statement with Court by 9/30/2013. (Marciel, M)
October 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/2/13: The deadline for Defendant Andrea Morgan to file a Response to the Interpleader Complaint is extended from September 24, 2013 to November 1, 2013; the parties' deadline to file a Joint Status Conference Statement is extended from September 30, 2013, to December 6, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/5/13: The deadline for Defendant Andrea Morgan to file a Response to the Interpleader Complaint is extended from November 1, 2013 to December 6, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
December 18, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/12/13 ORDERING that the Joint Request for Extension of time 26 is GRANTED; The deadline for Defendant Andrea Morgan to file a Response to the Interpleader Complaint shall be extended to 1/17/2014, and the deadline for the parties to file their Joint Status Report also shall be extended to 1/17/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 24, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/22/2014 GRANTING defendant's 29 Petition. Defendant Ingerlisha Martinez is APPOINTED as Guardian Ad Litem to for minor petitioner A.M.. (Marciel, M)
January 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/28/2014 ORDERING 30 that the deadline for Defendant Andrea Morgan to file a Response to the Interpleader Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 2/28/2014.(Reader, L)
April 23, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/22/14 GRANTING 34 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem. Within 21 days of the date of this Order, Prudential shall cause the Remaining Death Benefit, in the amount of $200,000. 00 plus accrued claim interest, if any, to be paid into this Court's Registry to be held in an interest-bearing account pursuant to FRCP 67 and Local Rule 150. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon all parties within 5 court days of this Order. (Meuleman, A)
July 24, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/2014 ORDERING 46 Prudential's Motion for Interpleader Relief and Discharge is GRANTED; Prudential is therefore DISCHARGED of any and all further liability toindividua ls with competing claims against the proceeds of Prudential's SGLI policy payable as a result of the 6/29/2008 death of Xantavia M. Phillips; Prudential is accordingly DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; Although the first stage of the t wo part interpleader process has now been completed, the remaining parties must still litigate their entitlement to the interpled funds in the second phase of these proceedings; Counsel for Prudential shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on all parties within 30 days after the date it is electronically filed. (Reader, L) Modified on 7/24/2014 (Reader, L).
December 23, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Approval of Proposed Settlement, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/22/2014. The court approves the settlement of the minors' claims. Further, the court approves a fee award to attorney Fiel ds in the amount of $50,000. The Court hereby waives future compliance with Local Rule 202(f). Upon receipt and approval of a properly fashioned state court order, the Court shall direct the Clerk to disburse funds deposited into the Court' ;s Registry (Order, ECF 44 , as follows: the Remaining Death Benefit plus accrued interest, less $50,000, to the registry of the Fifth Judicial District Court In And For The Parish Of Richland State Of Louisiana. Attorney Fields shall provide this court with proof that the that the minor's money has been deposited in a blocked interest-bearing account held with a banking institution that is insured with the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation until the minor reaches the age of 18, within 20 days of deposit. Upon the Court's confirmation that the state court distribution plan has been completed, the Court shall direct the Clerk to disburse the remaining balance, in the amount of $50,000, to attorney Fields. If what is ordered occurs, this action shall be dismissed with prejudice with each side to bear its own cost. (Kastilahn, A)
March 4, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: APPROVAL OF STATE COURT ORDER AND DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/3/15. The Court directs the Clerk to disburse funds deposited by Prudential into the Court's Registry on 5/7/14, (see Receipt No. CAE200059841 in the total amount of $206,957.47 fbo Prudential), less the sum of $50,000 payable as attorneys' fee s to attorney Candice Fields. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Katherine Kettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingerlisha Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M. (minor child of Ingerlisha Martinez)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]