DuBois v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann DuBois
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00827
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 14 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 13 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2013. Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 11/20/2013. (Marciel, M)
December 23, 2013 17 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/23/13 re: 16 GRANTING first extension of time for defendant to file her Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
January 24, 2014 19 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/24/2014 GRANTING 18 Defendants Second extension of time to file their motion for summary judgment due by 2/20/2014. (Reader, L)
April 14, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/2014 DENYING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
April 30, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/30/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is fu rther directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DuBois v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Jeffrey T Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann DuBois
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]