Kmbuaar v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Nary Yang Kmbuaar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00829
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/20/2013 ORDERING that the 13 stipulation for extension of time is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall file her Motion For Summary Judgment on or before 11/18/2013. (Zignago, K.)
September 29, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/25/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted; the Commissioner's cross-motion for summary judgment is denied; the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the plaintiff's favor; and the matter is remanded for further consideration consistent with this opinion. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
April 30, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/30/2013 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Cler k of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM an original and 5 copies each of the completed summons, the complaint, and th e scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. The USM shall thereafter file a statement with the court that said documents have been served. (cc: USM) (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kmbuaar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nary Yang Kmbuaar
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]