Saffold v. Hill

Respondent: Rick Hill
Petitioner: Tony Eugene Saffold
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00833
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/6/2014 GRANTING petitioner's 7 application to proceed IFP; and RECOMMENDING that petitioner's first claim be dismissed for failure to state a cognizab le claim for federal habeas corpus relief; petitioner's second and third claims be dismissed without prejudice to petitioner obtaining any relief that may be available to him as a memeber of the plaintiff class in Gilman v. Fisher; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 6, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2013 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
June 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/11/13 ORDERING that this action is reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings; henceforth, the caption on documents filed in this action shall be shown as Case No. 2:13-cv-0833 JAM DAD P; and the Clerk of the Court shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Saffold v. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Eugene Saffold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]