California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Beard

Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Case Number: 2:2013cv00840
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/1/13. The matter is STAYED for all purposes except settlement negotiations and related activities until 60 days from the date of the Court's order. The Status Conference is CONTINUED to 3/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Joint Status Conference Report shall be due 14 days prior to the Status Conference. (Meuleman, A)
January 13, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/12/2015 AMENDING the 15 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; ORDERING each party to comply with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2)(B) and (C)'s initial expert witness disclosure requiremen ts by 10/1/2015; ORDERING each party to comply with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2)(D)(ii)'s contradictory and/or rebuttal expert disclosure requirements by 11/1/2015; ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 3/1/2016; ORDERING t hat all dispositive motions be heard by 4/18/2016 at 9:00 AM; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 6/27/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; CONTINUING the trial date to 9/20/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Michel, G)
March 12, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/11/2015 ORDERING that a dispositional document shall be filed no later than 5/26/2015. (Zignago, K.)
May 4, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/1/2015 ORDERING 21 that Plaintiff CA Sportfishing Protection Alliances claims against Defendant Jeffrey Beard, in his official capacity as Secretary of the CDCR, as set forth in CSPA' 60-Day No tice Letter and Complaint, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear their own attorney fees and costs, except as provided for by the terms of the accompanying Consent Judgment; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain and have jurisdiction over the Parties solely for the purpose of resolving disputes arising under the Consent Judgment attached to the Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss as Exhibit A until 9/30/2017. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
July 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/4/2013 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED for all purposes except settlement negotiations and related activities until sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. The Status Confe rence presently scheduled for 7/22/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 is hereby CONTINUED to 10/28/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. All other filings and/or requirements in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules related to or triggered by the 7/22/2013 Status Conference, if any, are hereby CONTINUED to new dates based on the new Status Conference date herein. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
September 16, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 8 to stay matter signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/13/2013. This matter is STAYED for all purposes except settlement negotiations and related activities until 10/14/2013. Status Conference is CONTINUED to for 12/9/2 013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB). Joint Status Conference Report shall be due 14 days prior to Conference Hearing. All other filings and/or requirements in Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules related to or triggered by the 10/28/2013 Status Conference, if any, are CONTINUED to new dates based on new Status Conference date. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Laurie Ann Mikkelsen
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.