Iniguez v. The CBE Group, Inc.

Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nancy Iniguez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00843
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/29/2013. A party shall file a Notice of Related Cases document no later than 6/5/2013 in case of 2:12-cv-02354 JAM AC [Iniguez v. Dish Network LLC]. Alternatively, each party shall SHO W CAUSE why a sanction should not be imposed for failure to comply with Local Rule 123 ("OSC") in filing due no later than 6/5/2013. If Hearing is desired on OSC, it shall be requested in above referenced filing. Further, due to each party's failure to comply with Local Rule 123, pending 14 Motion to Dismiss is deemed WITHDRAWN and the hearing set for 7/1/2013 is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
September 5, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Class, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/5/13. Defendant is ordered to file a responsive pleading within 20 days of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
December 5, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER denying 26 Motion signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/4/13. (Kaminski, H)
April 29, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/28/14. The actions is DISMISSED with prejudice as to plaintiffs individual claims and without prejudice as to the claims of the putative class members. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Iniguez v. The CBE Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Patrick Flynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Iniguez
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Jason Alan Ibey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]